ND 4020 | 2015-2016 | 64th Legislative Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on March 24 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-24 - Filed with Secretary Of State 03/24
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

A concurrent resolution urging Congress to establish food labeling standards, direct the clarification of voluntary food labeling standards, and provide for a review of foods derived through the use of biotechnology.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A concurrent resolution urging Congress to establish food labeling standards, direct the clarification of voluntary food labeling standards, and provide for a review of foods derived through the use of biotechnology.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-03-19 - House - House Second reading, adopted (Y: 78 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-03-24SenateFiled with Secretary Of State 03/24
2015-03-24SenateSigned by President
2015-03-24HouseSigned by Speaker
2015-03-20SenateReturned to Senate
2015-03-19HouseSecond reading, adopted yeas 78 nays 10
2015-03-17HouseReported back, do pass, place on calendar 11 1 1
2015-03-13HouseCommittee Hearing 09:00
2015-02-25HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Agriculture Committee
2015-02-24HouseReceived from Senate
2015-02-19SenateSecond reading, adopted
2015-02-13SenateReported back, do pass, place on calendar 6 0 0
2015-02-12SenateCommittee Hearing 09:00
2015-01-29SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred Agriculture Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback