ND SCR4016 | 2019-2020 | 66th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on April 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-10 - Filed with Secretary Of State 04/10
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on April 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-10 - Filed with Secretary Of State 04/10
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A concurrent resolution to amend and reenact subsections 2 and 6 of section 6 of article VIII of the Constitution of North Dakota, relating to the membership and meeting requirements of the state board of higher education; to provide for transition; and to provide an effective date.
Title
The membership and meeting requirements of the state board of higher education; to provide for transition; and to provide an effective date.
Sponsors
Sen. Rich Wardner [R] | Sen. Brad Bekkedahl [R] | Sen. Joan Heckaman [D] | Rep. Corey Mock [D] |
Rep. Mike Nathe [R] | Rep. Shannon Roers Jones [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-08 - Senate - Senate Second reading, adopted (Y: 27 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2019-04-02 - House - House Second reading, adopted as amended (Y: 50 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2019-04-01 - House - House Second reading (Y: 42 N: 46 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2019-03-07 - Senate - Senate Second reading, adopted (Y: 29 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2019-03-07 - Senate - Senate Second reading, adopted (Y: 29 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2019-04-02 - House - House Second reading, adopted as amended (Y: 50 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2019-04-01 - House - House Second reading (Y: 42 N: 46 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2019-03-07 - Senate - Senate Second reading, adopted (Y: 29 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2019-03-07 - Senate - Senate Second reading, adopted (Y: 29 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-10 | Senate | Filed with Secretary Of State 04/10 |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-04-09 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Second reading, adopted yeas 27 nays 17 |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Concurred |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Returned to Senate (12) |
2019-04-02 | House | Second reading, adopted as amended yeas 50 nays 41 |
2019-04-02 | House | Reconsidered |
2019-04-01 | House | Second reading, failed to adopt yeas 42 nays 46 |
2019-03-29 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2019-03-28 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 9 5 0 |
2019-03-19 | House | Committee Hearing 03:00 |
2019-03-11 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee |
2019-03-08 | House | Received from Senate |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Second reading, adopted yeas 29 nays 14 |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Request return from committee |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Rereferred to Education |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 7 0 0 |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Committee Hearing 02:30 |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Education Committee |