ND SCR4009 | 2019-2020 | 66th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-15 - Filed with Secretary Of State 03/15
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-15 - Filed with Secretary Of State 03/15
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A concurrent resolution directing the Legislative Management to consider studying the feasibility and desirability of the water resource boards in each drainage basin forming a joint water resource board to plan and construct water conveyance projects based on basinwide needs.
Title
A concurrent resolution directing the Legislative Management to consider studying the feasibility and desirability of the water resource boards in each drainage basin forming a joint water resource board to plan and construct water conveyance projects based on basinwide needs.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-15 | Senate | Filed with Secretary Of State 03/15 |
2019-03-15 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-03-15 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Returned to Senate |
2019-03-13 | House | Second reading, adopted |
2019-03-11 | House | Reported back, do pass, placed on consent calendar 13 0 1 |
2019-03-07 | House | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2019-02-18 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Agriculture Committee |
2019-02-11 | House | Received from Senate |
2019-02-08 | Senate | Second reading, adopted |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 6 0 0 |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Committee Hearing 03:00 |
2019-01-23 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Energy and Natural Resources Committee |