ND SCR4008 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on March 17 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-17 - Filed with Secretary Of State 03/17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on March 17 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-17 - Filed with Secretary Of State 03/17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A concurrent resolution urging the federal government to refrain from enacting regulations that threaten the reliability and affordability of electric power in North Dakota and to increase its support for research, development, and deployment for next generation carbon-based energy generation.
Title
A concurrent resolution urging the federal government to refrain from enacting regulations that threaten the reliability and affordability of electric power in North Dakota and to increase its support for research, development, and deployment for next generation carbon-based energy generation.
Sponsors
Sen. Jon Casper [R] | Sen. Curtiss Kreun [R] | Sen. Erin Oban [D] | Rep. Todd Porter [R] |
Rep. Shannon Roers Jones [R] | Rep. Jay Seibel [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-17 | Senate | Filed with Secretary Of State 03/17 |
2017-03-17 | Senate | Signed by President |
2017-03-17 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Returned to Senate |
2017-03-15 | House | Second reading, adopted |
2017-03-13 | House | Reported back, do pass, placed on consent calendar 13 0 1 |
2017-03-09 | House | Committee Hearing 04:00 |
2017-02-22 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Energy and Natural Resources Committee |
2017-02-21 | House | Received from Senate |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Second reading, adopted |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 7 0 0 |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Committee Hearing 09:30 |
2017-01-26 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Energy and Natural Resources Committee |