ND SCR4006 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 17 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-29 - Second reading, failed to adopt yeas 12 nays 79
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 17 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-29 - Second reading, failed to adopt yeas 12 nays 79
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A concurrent resolution making a formal application to Congress to call a countermand amendment convention for the sole purpose of proposing an amendment to the United States Constitution to provide states a process to collectively countermand or repeal any federal law or ruling.
Title
A concurrent resolution making a formal application to Congress to call a countermand amendment convention for the sole purpose of proposing an amendment to the United States Constitution to provide states a process to collectively countermand or repeal any federal law or ruling.
Sponsors
Sen. Oley Larsen [R] | Sen. David Clemens [R] | Sen. Shawn Vedaa [R] | Rep. Charles Damschen [R] |
Rep. Aaron Mcwilliams [R] | Rep. Roscoe Streyle [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-29 - House - House Second reading (Y: 12 N: 79 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-29 | House | Second reading, failed to adopt yeas 12 nays 79 |
2017-03-27 | House | Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 10 3 1 |
2017-03-03 | House | Committee Hearing 08:30 |
2017-02-20 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Government and Veterans Affairs Committee |
2017-02-17 | House | Received from Senate |
2017-02-03 | Senate | Second reading, adopted |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 4 1 1 |
2017-01-26 | Senate | Committee Hearing 10:15 |
2017-01-03 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Government and Veterans Affairs Committee |