ND 3037 | 2019-2020 | 66th Legislative Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-01 - Second reading, failed to adopt
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

A concurrent resolution clarifying the 1975 ratification by the 44th Legislative Assembly of the proposed 1972 Equal Rights Amendment to the Constitution of the United States was valid only through March 22, 1979.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A concurrent resolution clarifying the 1975 ratification by the 44th Legislative Assembly of the proposed 1972 Equal Rights Amendment to the Constitution of the United States was valid only through March 22, 1979.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-05 - House - House Second reading, adopted (Y: 67 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-01SenateSecond reading, failed to adopt
2019-04-01SenateAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2019-03-29SenateReported back amended, do not pass, placed on calendar 7 0 0
2019-03-28SenateCommittee Hearing 02:45
2019-03-06SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred Government and Veterans Affairs Committee
2019-03-06SenateReceived from House
2019-03-05HouseSecond reading, adopted yeas 67 nays 21
2019-03-04HouseAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2019-03-01HouseReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 12 2 0
2019-02-28HouseCommittee Hearing 02:00
2019-02-20HouseRereferred to Government and Veterans Affairs
2019-02-19HouseAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2019-02-18HouseReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 12 2 0
2019-02-15HouseCommittee Hearing 09:00
2019-01-24HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Government and Veterans Affairs Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback