ND HCR3011 | 2013-2014 | 63rd Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 3 2013 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-03 - Signed by Speaker
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on May 3 2013 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-03 - Signed by Speaker
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A concurrent resolution to amend and reenact section
Title
The fiscal impact of measures to initiate constitutional amendments and to the placing of initiated measures on the ballot.
Sponsors
Rep. Al Carlson [R] | Rep. Jeff Delzer [R] | Rep. William Devlin [R] | Rep. David Monson [R] |
Sen. Tony Grindberg [R] | Sen. David Hogue [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-03 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2013-05-03 | Senate | Signed by President |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Second reading, adopted as amended yeas 29 nays 18 |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Conference committee report adopted |
2013-04-22 | Senate | Reported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar |
2013-04-22 | House | Second reading, adopted yeas 54 nays 35 |
2013-04-22 | House | Conference committee report adopted |
2013-04-22 | House | Reported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Conference committee appointed Hogue Armstrong Grabinger |
2013-04-17 | House | Appoint Rep. Hanson to replace Rep. Maragos on conference committee |
2013-04-16 | House | Conference committee appointed Paur Klemin Maragos |
2013-04-16 | House | Refused to concur |
2013-04-04 | House | Returned to House (12) |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Second reading, adopted as amended yeas 25 nays 20 |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 4 3 0 |
2013-04-01 | Senate | Committee Hearing 10:30 |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Received from House |
2013-03-21 | House | Second reading, adopted yeas 75 nays 17 |
2013-03-20 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2013-03-19 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 9 3 2 |
2013-03-06 | House | Committee Hearing 10:00 |
2013-01-15 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee |