ND SB2357 | 2019-2020 | 66th Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on January 30 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-14 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 18 nays 71
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on January 30 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-14 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 18 nays 71
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL for an Act to provide for a Bank of North Dakota loan guarantee program for federal workers affected by the federal shutdown; and to declare an emergency.
Title
A BILL for an Act to provide for a Bank of North Dakota loan guarantee program for federal workers affected by the federal shutdown; and to declare an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-14 - House - House Second reading (Y: 18 N: 71 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2019-01-29 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 41 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 41 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-14 | House | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 18 nays 71 |
2019-03-11 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2019-03-08 | House | Reported back amended, do not pass, placed on calendar 8 5 1 |
2019-03-07 | House | Committee Hearing 02:15 |
2019-02-18 | House | Introduced, first reading, (emergency), referred Government and Veterans Affairs Committee |
2019-01-30 | House | Received from Senate |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 41 nays 4, Emergency clause carried |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 7 0 0 |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Committee Hearing 02:15 |
2019-01-21 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, (emergency), referred Government and Veterans Affairs Committee |