ND 2350 | 2019-2020 | 66th Legislative Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on March 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-14 - Signed by Governor 03/14
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT to create and enact a new section to chapter 57-06 and a new section to chapter 57-33.2 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to county auditor verification of information reported by public utility companies and electric generation, distribution, and transmission companies; to amend and reenact sections 57-06-21, 57-08-01, and 57-33.2-06 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the review of public utility assessments and public utility and electric generation, distribution, and transmission reports received by county auditors; and to provide an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

The review of public utility assessments and public utility and electric generation, distribution, and transmission reports received by county auditors; and to provide an effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-11 - House - House Second reading (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-14SenateSigned by Governor 03/14
2019-03-13SenateSent to Governor
2019-03-13SenateSigned by President
2019-03-13HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-03-12SenateReturned to Senate
2019-03-11HouseSecond reading, passed, yeas 91 nays 0
2019-03-06HouseReported back, do pass, place on calendar 12 0 2
2019-03-06HouseCommittee Hearing 09:00
2019-02-18HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Finance and Taxation Committee
2019-02-06HouseReceived from Senate
2019-02-05SenateSecond reading, passed, yeas 46 nays 0
2019-02-04SenateReported back, do pass, place on calendar 6 0 0
2019-02-04SenateCommittee Hearing 10:00
2019-01-21SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred Finance and Taxation Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback