ND SB2336 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on March 24 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-24 - Signed by Governor 03/23
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on March 24 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-24 - Signed by Governor 03/23
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to provide for a legislative management study of occupational boards that address mental health and behavioral health.
Title
AN ACT to provide for a legislative management study of occupational boards that address mental health and behavioral health.
Sponsors
Sen. Judy Lee [R] | Sen. Howard Anderson [R] | Sen. Kristin Roers [R] | Rep. George Keiser [R] |
Rep. Karen Rohr [R] | Rep. Robin Weisz [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-16 - House - House Second reading (Y: 89 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-24 | Senate | Signed by Governor 03/23 |
2021-03-19 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2021-03-19 | Senate | Signed by President |
2021-03-18 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Returned to Senate |
2021-03-16 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 89 nays 5 |
2021-03-12 | House | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 13 1 0 |
2021-03-10 | House | Committee Hearing 02:30 |
2021-02-19 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Human Services Committee |
2021-02-11 | House | Received from Senate |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 46 nays 1 |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 6 0 0 |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Committee Hearing 10:45 |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Human Services Committee |