ND SB2324 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 14 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-14 - Signed by Governor 03/13
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 14 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-14 - Signed by Governor 03/13
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to amend and reenact section 15.1-15-01 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to school district employee performance reviews.
Title
School district employee performance reviews.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-06 - House - House Second reading (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-03 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-03 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-14 | Senate | Signed by Governor 03/13 |
2017-03-10 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Signed by President |
2017-03-08 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Returned to Senate |
2017-03-06 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 94 nays 0 |
2017-03-02 | House | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 14 0 0 |
2017-03-01 | House | Committee Hearing 02:30 |
2017-02-22 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Education Committee |
2017-02-20 | House | Received from Senate |
2017-02-03 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 45 nays 0 |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 5 0 1 |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Committee Hearing 09:30 |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Education Committee |