ND SB2317 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-13 - Signed by Governor 04/12
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-13 - Signed by Governor 04/12
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to create and enact chapter 15-72 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the establishment of a coal mine reclamation trust utilizing private assets; to provide a continuing appropriation; and to provide for a transfer.
Title
The establishment of a coal mine reclamation trust utilizing private assets; to provide a continuing appropriation; and to provide for a transfer.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-07 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 43 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - House - House Second reading (Y: 90 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 42 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - House - House Second reading (Y: 90 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 42 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-13 | Senate | Signed by Governor 04/12 |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Signed by President |
2021-04-08 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 43 nays 4 |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Concurred |
2021-03-19 | Senate | Returned to Senate (12) |
2021-03-18 | House | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 90 nays 2 |
2021-03-15 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2021-03-12 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 14 0 0 |
2021-03-11 | House | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2021-03-04 | House | Committee Hearing 01:30 |
2021-02-24 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Energy and Natural Resources Committee |
2021-02-17 | House | Received from Senate |
2021-02-16 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 42 nays 5 |
2021-02-16 | Senate | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2021-02-15 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 5 1 0 |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Committee Hearing 10:00 |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Energy and Natural Resources Committee |