ND 2314 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 23 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-03 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 13 nays 77
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact subsection 7 of section 49-22-09 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to factors to be considered in evaluating applications and designations of sites, corridors, and routes; and to provide for a legislative management study of a long-term energy plan for the state.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Factors to be considered in evaluating applications and designations of sites, corridors, and routes; and to provide for a legislative management study of a long-term energy plan for the state.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-03 - House - House Second reading (Y: 13 N: 77 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2017-02-22 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 42 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-22 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 42 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-03HouseSecond reading, failed to pass, yeas 13 nays 77
2017-04-03HouseAmendment failed, placed on calendar
2017-03-31HouseReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 10 4 0
2017-03-16HouseCommittee Hearing 10:00
2017-03-01HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Energy and Natural Resources Committee
2017-02-23HouseReceived from Senate
2017-02-22SenateSecond reading, passed, yeas 42 nays 4
2017-02-22SenateAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2017-02-22SenateDivision B lost
2017-02-22SenateDivision A adopted
2017-02-22SenateDivision of amendment
2017-02-22SenateReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 4 3 0
2017-02-21SenateRereferred to Energy and Natural Resources
2017-02-09SenateCommittee Hearing 09:00
2017-01-23SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred Energy and Natural Resources Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback