ND 2292 | 2015-2016 | 64th Legislative Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 20 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-20 - Signed by Governor 04/20
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT to amend and reenact subsection 5 of section 57-38-04 and sections 57-38.1-09, 57-59-01, 57-59-05, 57-59-06, and 57-59-08 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to apportionment of business income and the multistate tax compact; to repeal section 57-59-02 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the optional computation provision of the multistate tax compact; and to provide an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

The optional computation provision of the multistate tax compact; and to provide an effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-04-16 - House - House Second reading (Y: 70 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-04-14 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 44 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-14 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 44 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-30 - House - House Second reading (Y: 75 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-18 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-04-20SenateSigned by Governor 04/20
2015-04-20SenateSent to Governor
2015-04-20SenateSigned by President
2015-04-17HouseSigned by Speaker
2015-04-16HouseSecond reading, passed as amended, yeas 70 nays 22
2015-04-16HouseConference committee report adopted
2015-04-15HouseReported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar
2015-04-14SenateSecond reading, passed, yeas 44 nays 2
2015-04-14SenateConference committee report adopted
2015-04-14SenateReported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar
2015-04-07HouseConference committee appointed Headland Owens Haak
2015-04-06SenateConference committee appointed Cook Laffen Triplett
2015-04-06SenateRefused to concur
2015-04-02SenateRefused to concur
2015-03-31SenateReturned to Senate (12)
2015-03-30HouseSecond reading, passed as amended, yeas 75 nays 18
2015-03-26HouseAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2015-03-25HouseReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 11 3 0
2015-03-11HouseCommittee Hearing 09:00
2015-02-20HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Finance and Taxation Committee
2015-02-19HouseReceived from Senate
2015-02-18SenateSecond reading, passed, yeas 46 nays 1
2015-02-18SenateAmendment adopted
2015-02-18SenateAmendment proposed on floor
2015-02-16SenateReported back, do pass, place on calendar 13 0 0
2015-02-16SenateCommittee Hearing 10:00
2015-02-11SenateRereferred to Appropriations
2015-02-11SenateAmendment adopted
2015-02-10SenateReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 6 1 0
2015-02-02SenateCommittee Hearing 10:15
2015-01-19SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred Finance and Taxation Committee

North Dakota State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/64-2015/bill-actions/ba2292.html
Texthttp://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/64-2015/documents/15-8198-01000.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/64-2015/documents/15-8198-01002a.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/64-2015/documents/15-8198-02000.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/64-2015/documents/15-8198-03000.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/64-2015/documents/15-8198-04000.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/64-2015/documents/15-8198-05000.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/64-2015/documents/15-8198-06000.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/64-2015/journals/sr-dailyjnl-32.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/64-2015/journals/hr-dailyjnl-57.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/64-2015/journals/sr-dailyjnl-67.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/64-2015/journals/hr-dailyjnl-69.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback