ND SB2289 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on March 17 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-17 - Signed by Governor 03/16
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on March 17 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-17 - Signed by Governor 03/16
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to amend and reenact sections 51-07-01.2, 51-07-02.2, and 51-26-06 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to prohibited practices under farm equipment dealership contracts, dealership transfers, and reimbursement for warranty repair.
Title
Prohibited practices under farm equipment dealership contracts, dealership transfers, and reimbursement for warranty repair.
Sponsors
Sen. Kelly Armstrong [R] | Sen. Dwight Cook [R] | Sen. Jerry Klein [R] | Rep. Michael Howe [R] |
Rep. Donald Vigesaa [R] | Rep. Lois Delmore [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-13 - House - House Second reading (Y: 86 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-17 | Senate | Signed by Governor 03/16 |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Signed by President |
2017-03-14 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Returned to Senate |
2017-03-13 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 86 nays 5 |
2017-03-10 | House | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 13 0 1 |
2017-03-09 | House | Committee Hearing 10:00 |
2017-03-02 | House | Committee Hearing 10:00 |
2017-02-22 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Agriculture Committee |
2017-02-20 | House | Received from Senate |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 46 nays 0 |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 6 0 0 |
2017-02-03 | Senate | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Rereferred to Agriculture |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Request return from committee |
2017-01-19 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Industry, Business and Labor Committee |