ND SB2277 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 22 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-22 - Signed by Governor 03/22
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 22 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-22 - Signed by Governor 03/22
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to create and enact a new section to chapter 14-09 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to child support obligations of incarcerated parents.
Title
Child support obligations of incarcerated parents.
Sponsors
Sen. Rich Wardner [R] | Rep. Mike Lefor [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-14 - House - House Second reading (Y: 53 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-03 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-03 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-22 | Senate | Signed by Governor 03/22 |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Signed by President |
2017-03-16 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Returned to Senate |
2017-03-14 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 53 nays 39 |
2017-03-09 | House | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 12 3 0 |
2017-03-08 | House | Committee Hearing 10:15 |
2017-02-20 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee |
2017-02-17 | House | Received from Senate |
2017-02-03 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 45 nays 0 |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 7 0 0 |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Committee Hearing 10:45 |
2017-01-16 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Human Services Committee |