ND 2276 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 19 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-19 - Signed by Governor 04/16
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT to amend and reenact section 44-04-18.3 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to confidentiality of law enforcement personnel records.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Confidentiality of law enforcement personnel records.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-08 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - House - House Second reading (Y: 57 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-19SenateSigned by Governor 04/16
2021-04-14SenateSent to Governor
2021-04-14SenateSigned by President
2021-04-14HouseSigned by Speaker
2021-04-08SenateSecond reading, passed, yeas 46 nays 0
2021-04-08SenateConcurred
2021-03-30SenateReturned to Senate (12)
2021-03-29HouseSecond reading, passed as amended, yeas 57 nays 36
2021-03-26HouseAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2021-03-25HouseReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 8 5 1
2021-03-22HouseCommittee Hearing 10:30
2021-02-23HouseRereferred to Judiciary
2021-02-23HouseRequest return from committee
2021-02-19HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Transportation Committee
2021-02-12HouseReceived from Senate
2021-02-11SenateSecond reading, passed, yeas 47 nays 0
2021-02-10SenateAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2021-02-09SenateReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 7 0 0
2021-02-03SenateCommittee Hearing 10:00
2021-01-21SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback