ND SB2271 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-26 - Signed by Governor 04/23
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-26 - Signed by Governor 04/23
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to provide a statement of legislative intent regarding presidential elections; to provide for a legislative management study; and to provide a directive.
Title
AN ACT to provide a statement of legislative intent regarding presidential elections; to provide for a legislative management study; and to provide a directive.
Sponsors
Sen. Robert Erbele [R] | Sen. Dick Dever [R] | Sen. Curtiss Kreun [R] | Rep. Dennis Johnson [R] |
Rep. Wayne Trottier [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-20 - House - House Second reading (Y: 80 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - House - House Second reading (Y: 80 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 39 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-09 - House - House Second reading (Y: 84 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 43 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - House - House Second reading (Y: 80 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 39 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-09 - House - House Second reading (Y: 84 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 43 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-26 | Senate | Signed by Governor 04/23 |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Signed by President |
2021-04-22 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2021-04-20 | House | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 80 nays 12 |
2021-04-20 | House | Conference committee report adopted |
2021-04-20 | House | Reported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 39 nays 8 |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Conference committee report adopted |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Reported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar |
2021-04-15 | House | Conference committee appointed Kasper Rohr B. Koppelman |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Conference committee appointed Meyer Vedaa Marcellais |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Refused to concur |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Returned to Senate (12) |
2021-04-09 | House | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 84 nays 6 |
2021-04-06 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2021-04-05 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 12 1 1 |
2021-03-18 | House | Committee Hearing 08:30 |
2021-03-09 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Government and Veterans Affairs Committee |
2021-02-18 | House | Received from Senate |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 43 nays 3 |
2021-02-15 | Senate | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2021-02-12 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 7 0 0 |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Committee Hearing 10:30 |
2021-01-19 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Government and Veterans Affairs Committee |