ND SB2259 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-13 - Signed by Governor 04/12
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-13 - Signed by Governor 04/12
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to create and enact chapter 51-25.1 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to tobacco product manufacturer certification, service, and reporting requirements; and to provide a penalty.
Title
Tobacco product manufacturer certification, service, and reporting requirements; and to provide a penalty.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-01 - House - House Second reading (Y: 66 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-13 | Senate | Signed by Governor 04/12 |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Signed by President |
2021-04-08 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2021-04-05 | Senate | Returned to Senate |
2021-04-01 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 66 nays 26 |
2021-03-25 | House | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 9 5 0 |
2021-03-10 | House | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2021-02-19 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Industry, Business and Labor Committee |
2021-01-29 | House | Received from Senate |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 46 nays 0 |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 6 0 0 |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Committee Hearing 10:00 |
2021-01-18 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Industry, Business and Labor Committee |