ND 2231 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-10 - Signed by Governor 04/10
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT to create and enact a new section to chapter 23-16 and four new sections to chapter 26.1-47 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to informed decisionmaking for choosing air ambulance service providers, preferred provider arrangement requirements for insurance prior authorization for air ambulance services, and air ambulance subscriptions; to amend and reenact section 26.1-47-01, subsection? 6 of section 26.1-47-02, and section 26.1-47-07 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to preferred provider organizations; to provide an effective date; and to provide a contingent effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Preferred provider organizations; to provide an effective date; and to provide a contingent effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-05 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 43 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-04 - House - House Second reading (Y: 72 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-02-09 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 40 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-10SenateSigned by Governor 04/10
2017-04-07SenateSent to Governor
2017-04-07SenateSigned by President
2017-04-07HouseSigned by Speaker
2017-04-05SenateSecond reading, passed, yeas 43 nays 4
2017-04-05SenateConcurred
2017-04-04SenateReturned to Senate (12)
2017-04-04HouseSecond reading, passed as amended, yeas 72 nays 19
2017-04-03HouseAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2017-03-31HouseReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 9 4 1
2017-03-07HouseCommittee Hearing 09:15
2017-02-20HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Human Services Committee
2017-02-17HouseReceived from Senate
2017-02-09SenateSecond reading, passed, yeas 40 nays 5
2017-02-08SenateAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2017-02-07SenateReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 7 0 0
2017-01-31SenateCommittee Hearing 09:00
2017-01-16SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred Human Services Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback