ND SB2213 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on April 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-29 - Signed by Governor 04/28
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on April 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-29 - Signed by Governor 04/28
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to amend and reenact section 57-02-08.8 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the property tax credit for disabled veterans; and to provide an effective date.
Title
The property tax credit for disabled veterans; and to provide an effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-26 - House - House Second reading (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-04-23 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-23 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-09 - House - House Second reading (Y: 87 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 45 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-23 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-23 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-09 - House - House Second reading (Y: 87 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 45 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-29 | Senate | Signed by Governor 04/28 |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Signed by President |
2021-04-26 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2021-04-26 | House | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 91 nays 0 |
2021-04-26 | House | Conference committee report adopted |
2021-04-23 | House | Reported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 47 nays 0 |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Conference committee report adopted |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Reported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar |
2021-04-16 | House | Conference committee appointed B. Koppelman Bellew Kempenich |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Conference committee appointed Patten Dever Piepkorn |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Refused to concur |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Refused to concur |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Returned to Senate (12) |
2021-04-09 | House | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 87 nays 3 |
2021-04-06 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2021-04-05 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 12 5 4 |
2021-03-22 | House | Committee Hearing 09:30 |
2021-03-15 | House | Rereferred to Appropriations |
2021-03-15 | House | Reported back, do pass 13 1 0 |
2021-03-15 | House | Committee Hearing 10:00 |
2021-03-09 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Finance and Taxation Committee |
2021-02-23 | House | Received from Senate |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 45 nays 1 |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 14 0 0 |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Committee Hearing 08:30 |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Rereferred to Appropriations |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Amendment adopted |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 5 2 0 |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Committee Hearing 09:30 |
2021-01-14 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Finance and Taxation Committee |