ND 2206 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-26 - Signed by Governor 04/26
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT to create and enact chapter 50-34 and a new section to chapter 57-20 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the transition of funding responsibility for county social services from the counties to the state and a credit against payments in lieu of taxes paid by centrally assessed companies; to amend and reenact sections 11-23-01, 50-01.2-03.2, 50-06-05.8, 50-06-20.1, and 50-06.2-04, subsection 3 of section 57-15-01.1, section 57-15-06.7, and subdivision c of subsection 1 of section 57-20-07.1 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to county and multicounty social service board budgets, the human service grant program, county general fund levy limitations, and property tax statements; to suspend chapter 50-03 and sections 50-06-20.1 and 50-06.2-05 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to county human services funds, the human services grant program, and county human services levy authority; to repeal section 57-20-07.2 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the state-paid property tax relief credit; to provide for a report to the legislative management; to provide for a legislative management study; to provide an appropriation; to provide for a transfer; to provide an exemption; to provide an effective date; and to provide an expiration date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

The state-paid property tax relief credit; to provide for a report to the legislative management; to provide for a legislative management study; to provide an appropriation; to provide for a transfer; to provide an exemption; to provide an effective date; and to provide an expiration date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-24 - House - House Second reading (Y: 75 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-04-21 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 44 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-21 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 44 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-12 - House - House Second reading (Y: 75 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-04-12 - House - House Second reading (Y: 75 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 43 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 43 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-26SenateSigned by Governor 04/26
2017-04-25SenateSent to Governor
2017-04-25SenateSigned by President
2017-04-24HouseSigned by Speaker
2017-04-24HouseSecond reading, passed as amended, yeas 75 nays 15
2017-04-24HouseConference committee report adopted
2017-04-21HouseReported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar
2017-04-21SenateSecond reading, passed, yeas 44 nays 3
2017-04-21SenateConference committee report adopted
2017-04-21SenateReported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar
2017-04-13HouseConference committee appointed Headland Dockter Mitskog
2017-04-13SenateConference committee appointed Bekkedahl Cook Dotzenrod
2017-04-13SenateRefused to concur
2017-04-12SenateReturned to Senate (12)
2017-04-12HouseSecond reading, passed as amended, yeas 75 nays 15
2017-04-12HouseAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2017-04-12HouseReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 10 4 0
2017-04-10HouseRereferred to Finance and Taxation
2017-04-06HouseLaid over one legislative day
2017-04-05HouseLaid over one legislative day
2017-04-04HouseLaid over one legislative day
2017-04-03HouseLaid over one legislative day
2017-03-31HouseLaid over one legislative day
2017-03-30HouseReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 11 1 2
2017-03-15HouseCommittee Hearing 09:00
2017-03-01HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Finance and Taxation Committee
2017-02-22HouseReceived from Senate
2017-02-21SenateSecond reading, passed, yeas 43 nays 2
2017-02-21SenateAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2017-02-21SenateReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 11 2 1
2017-02-06SenateCommittee Hearing 10:00
2017-02-01SenateRereferred to Appropriations
2017-02-01SenateReported back, do pass 6 0 0
2017-01-25SenateCommittee Hearing 09:00
2017-01-13SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred Finance and Taxation Committee

North Dakota State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/65-2017/bill-actions/ba2206.html
Texthttp://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/65-2017/documents/17-0760-01000.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/65-2017/documents/17-0760-02000.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/65-2017/documents/17-0760-03000.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/65-2017/documents/17-0760-04000.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/65-2017/documents/17-0760-02010a.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/65-2017/documents/17-0760-06000.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/65-2017/documents/17-0760-07000.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/65-2017/journals/sr-dailyjnl-34.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/65-2017/journals/hr-dailyjnl-66.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/65-2017/journals/sr-dailyjnl-73.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/65-2017/journals/hr-dailyjnl-74.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback