ND SB2203 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-12 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 8 nays 39
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-12 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 8 nays 39
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL for an Act to create and enact a new subsection to section 52-04-06 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to surcharges paid by employers for employees who receive unemployment insurance benefits; and to provide an effective date.
Title
Surcharges paid by employers for employees who receive unemployment insurance benefits; and to provide an effective date.
Sponsors
Sen. Jim Roers [R] | Sen. Jordan Kannianen [R] | Sen. Ronald Sorvaag [R] | Rep. George Keiser [R] |
Rep. Dan Ruby [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-02-12 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 8 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-12 | Senate | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 8 nays 39 |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 6 0 0 |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Committee Hearing 02:15 |
2021-01-14 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Industry, Business and Labor Committee |