ND SB2200 | 2011-2012 | 62nd Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-21 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 2 nays 44
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-21 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 2 nays 44
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL for an Act to provide an appropriation to the department of transportation for a grant for the Cattail Bay road improvement project.
Title
A BILL for an Act to provide an appropriation to the department of transportation for a grant for the Cattail Bay road improvement project.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-21 | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 2 nays 44 | |
2011-02-18 | Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 12 1 0 | |
2011-01-21 | Committee Hearing 09:30 | |
2011-01-12 | Introduced, first reading, referred Appropriations Committee |
North Dakota State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/62-2011/bill-actions/ba2200.html |
Text | http://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/62-2011/documents/11-0539-01000.pdf |