ND 2194 | 2019-2020 | 66th Legislative Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Enrolled on March 15 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-03-18 - Sent to Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT to amend and reenact subdivision c of subsection 2 of section 39-06-14.1 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to motorcycle operator's licenses and motorized bicycles.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Motorcycle operator's licenses and motorized bicycles.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-13 - House - House Second reading (Y: 72 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 41 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-18SenateSent to Governor
2019-03-15SenateSigned by President
2019-03-15HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-03-14SenateReturned to Senate
2019-03-13HouseSecond reading, passed, yeas 72 nays 18
2019-03-08HouseReported back, do pass, place on calendar 10 3 1
2019-03-08HouseCommittee Hearing 09:15
2019-02-13HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Transportation Committee
2019-01-29HouseReceived from Senate
2019-01-28SenateSecond reading, passed, yeas 41 nays 4
2019-01-25SenateReported back, do pass, place on calendar 6 0 0
2019-01-18SenateCommittee Hearing 10:00
2019-01-09SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred Transportation Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback