ND SB2191 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 10 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-10 - Signed by Governor 04/10
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 10 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-10 - Signed by Governor 04/10
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to provide an appropriation to the attorney general for grants.
Title
AN ACT to provide an appropriation to the attorney general for grants.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-05 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-04 - House - House Second reading (Y: 89 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-04 - House - House Second reading (Y: 89 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-10 | Senate | Signed by Governor 04/10 |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Signed by President |
2017-04-07 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 47 nays 0 |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Concurred |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Returned to Senate (12) |
2017-04-04 | House | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 89 nays 2 |
2017-04-03 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2017-03-31 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 19 1 1 |
2017-03-13 | House | Committee Hearing 02:00 |
2017-02-20 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Appropriations Committee |
2017-02-17 | House | Received from Senate |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 46 nays 0 |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 14 0 0 |
2017-01-30 | Senate | Committee Hearing 10:00 |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Rereferred to Appropriations |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Reported back, do pass 6 0 0 |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Committee Hearing 10:00 |
2017-01-12 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee |