ND 2189 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on April 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-18 - Signed by Governor 04/17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT to create and enact a new section to chapter 50-25.1 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the confidentiality of children's advocacy center records; and to amend and reenact subsection 3 of section 12.1-34-07 and subsection 1 of section 27-20-51 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to reimbursement of the cost of forensic interviews and confidentiality of juvenile court records and children's advocacy center records.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Reimbursement of the cost of forensic interviews and confidentiality of juvenile court records and children's advocacy center records.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-13 - House - House Second reading (Y: 87 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-04-12 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-29 - House - House Second reading (Y: 90 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-01-23 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-18SenateSigned by Governor 04/17
2017-04-14SenateSent to Governor
2017-04-14SenateSigned by President
2017-04-14HouseSigned by Speaker
2017-04-13HouseSecond reading, passed as amended, yeas 87 nays 3
2017-04-13HouseConference committee report adopted
2017-04-12HouseReported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar
2017-04-12SenateSecond reading, passed, yeas 46 nays 0
2017-04-12SenateConference committee report adopted
2017-04-10SenateReported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar
2017-04-05HouseConference committee appointed Porter D. Anderson P. Anderson
2017-04-03SenateConference committee appointed O. Larsen Kreun Piepkorn
2017-04-03SenateRefused to concur
2017-03-30SenateReturned to Senate (12)
2017-03-29HouseSecond reading, passed as amended, yeas 90 nays 2
2017-03-29HouseAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2017-03-28HouseReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 12 1 1
2017-03-15HouseCommittee Hearing 09:30
2017-02-20HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Human Services Committee
2017-02-17HouseReceived from Senate
2017-01-23SenateSecond reading, passed, yeas 44 nays 0
2017-01-20SenateAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2017-01-19SenateReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 7 0 0
2017-01-18SenateCommittee Hearing 10:30
2017-01-11SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred Human Services Committee

North Dakota State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/65-2017/bill-actions/ba2189.html
Texthttp://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/65-2017/documents/17-0726-02000.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/65-2017/documents/17-0726-02001a.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/65-2017/documents/17-0726-03000.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/65-2017/documents/17-0726-03001a.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/65-2017/documents/17-0726-04000.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/65-2017/documents/17-0726-03002a.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/65-2017/documents/17-0726-05000.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/65-2017/documents/17-0726-06000.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/65-2017/journals/sr-dailyjnl-13.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/65-2017/journals/hr-dailyjnl-57.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/65-2017/journals/sr-dailyjnl-66.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/65-2017/journals/hr-dailyjnl-67.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback