ND 2160 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on March 14 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-14 - Signed by Governor 03/13
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT to amend and reenact sections 11-18-01 and 57-28-04 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the duties of a recorder and providing notice of foreclosure of tax liens; and to provide an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

The duties of a recorder and providing notice of foreclosure of tax liens; and to provide an effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-03 - House - House Second reading (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-01-30 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-14SenateSigned by Governor 03/13
2017-03-09SenateSent to Governor
2017-03-07SenateSigned by President
2017-03-07HouseSigned by Speaker
2017-03-06SenateReturned to Senate
2017-03-03HouseSecond reading, passed, yeas 89 nays 0
2017-03-01HouseReported back, do pass, place on calendar 12 0 2
2017-03-01HouseCommittee Hearing 09:00
2017-02-22HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Finance and Taxation Committee
2017-02-20HouseReceived from Senate
2017-01-30SenateSecond reading, passed, yeas 45 nays 0
2017-01-27SenateAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2017-01-26SenateReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 6 0 0
2017-01-16SenateCommittee Hearing 09:00
2017-01-10SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred Finance and Taxation Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback