ND 2154 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on January 26 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-01-26 - Signed by Governor 01/26
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT to provide for suspension of certain provisions of the North Dakota Compassionate Care Act; to provide a contingent expiration date; and to declare an emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to provide for suspension of certain provisions of the North Dakota Compassionate Care Act; to provide a contingent expiration date; and to declare an emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-01-20 - House - House Second reading (Y: 83 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2017-01-17 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-01-26SenateSigned by Governor 01/26
2017-01-24SenateSent to Governor
2017-01-24SenateSigned by President
2017-01-24HouseSigned by Speaker
2017-01-23SenateReturned to Senate
2017-01-20HouseSecond reading, passed, yeas 83 nays 1, Emergency clause carried
2017-01-19HouseReported back, do pass, place on calendar 11 2 1
2017-01-19HouseIntroduced, first reading, (emergency), referred Human Services Committee
2017-01-17HouseReceived from Senate
2017-01-17SenateSecond reading, passed, yeas 45 nays 0, Emergency clause carried
2017-01-16SenateReported back, do pass, place on calendar 7 0 0
2017-01-16SenateCommittee Hearing 09:00
2017-01-16HouseCommittee Hearing 09:00
2017-01-09SenateIntroduced, first reading, (emergency), referred Human Services Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback