ND SB2133 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-01 - Signed by Governor 03/31
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-01 - Signed by Governor 03/31
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to amend and reenact subsection 2 of section 23-27-02, subsection 2 of section 23-27-04, and sections 23-27-04.3, 23-27-04.9, and 50-24.1-38 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to services provided by emergency medical services operations and emergency medical services personnel; and to provide a penalty.
Title
Services provided by emergency medical services operations and emergency medical services personnel; and to provide a penalty.
Sponsors
Sen. Judy Lee [R] | Sen. Kristin Roers [R] | Rep. George Keiser [R] | Rep. Todd Porter [R] |
Rep. Greg Westlind [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-25 - House - House Second reading (Y: 74 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-01 | Senate | Signed by Governor 03/31 |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Signed by President |
2021-03-29 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2021-03-26 | Senate | Returned to Senate |
2021-03-25 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 74 nays 19 |
2021-03-23 | House | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 12 1 1 |
2021-03-09 | House | Committee Hearing 02:00 |
2021-02-19 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Human Services Committee |
2021-02-12 | House | Received from Senate |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 47 nays 0 |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 6 0 0 |
2021-01-19 | Senate | Committee Hearing 11:00 |
2021-01-05 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Human Services Committee |