ND 2073 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-01-27 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 0 nays 45
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL for an Act to provide an appropriation for defraying the expenses of the commissioner of university and school lands; to provide for transfers; to provide for distributions from permanent funds; and to provide an exemption.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A BILL for an Act to provide an appropriation for defraying the expenses of the commissioner of university and school lands; to provide for transfers; to provide for distributions from permanent funds; and to provide an exemption.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-01-27 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 0 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-01-27SenateSecond reading, failed to pass, yeas 0 nays 45
2017-01-26SenateReported back, do not pass, placed on consent calendar 14 0 0
2017-01-20SenateCommittee Hearing 09:30
2017-01-03SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred Appropriations Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback