ND 2051 | 2019-2020 | 66th Legislative Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 22 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-22 - Signed by Governor 03/21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT to create and enact chapter 14-09.4 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the Uniform Nonparent Custody and Visitation Act; to repeal section 14-09-05.1 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to grandparental rights of visitation; and to provide for application.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Grandparental rights of visitation; and to provide for application.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-18 - House - House Second reading (Y: 86 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-01-11 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-22SenateSigned by Governor 03/21
2019-03-21SenateSent to Governor
2019-03-21SenateSigned by President
2019-03-20HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-03-19SenateReturned to Senate
2019-03-18HouseSecond reading, passed, yeas 86 nays 6
2019-03-14HouseReported back, do pass, place on calendar 12 1 1
2019-03-05HouseCommittee Hearing 09:00
2019-02-14HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Human Services Committee
2019-01-14HouseReceived from Senate
2019-01-11SenateSecond reading, passed, yeas 47 nays 0
2019-01-10SenateAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2019-01-09SenateReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 6 0 0
2019-01-08SenateCommittee Hearing 11:00
2019-01-03SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred Human Services Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback