ND SB2044 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 24 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-24 - Signed by Governor 03/23
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 24 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-24 - Signed by Governor 03/23
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to amend and reenact section 39-03.1-10, subsection 2 of section 39-03.1-11.2, subsection 8 of section 54-52-17, subsection 10 of section 54-52-26, subsection 2 of section 54-52-28, subsection 2 of section 54-52.1-03.2, subsection 1 of section 54-52.1-03.3, and subsection 2 of section 54-52.6-21 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to public employees retirement system unpaid benefit payments, missing member confidentiality requirements, compliance with Internal Revenue Code distribution requirements, insurance programs for which retiree health insurance credit moneys may be used, and clarification of eligibility for retiree health insurance credit payments.
Title
Public employees retirement system unpaid benefit payments, missing member confidentiality requirements, compliance with Internal Revenue Code distribution requirements, insurance programs for which retiree health insurance credit moneys may be used, and clarification of eligibility for retiree health insurance credit payments.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-17 - House - House Second reading (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-01-15 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-15 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-24 | Senate | Signed by Governor 03/23 |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Signed by President |
2021-03-22 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Returned to Senate |
2021-03-17 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 91 nays 0 |
2021-03-12 | House | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 11 0 3 |
2021-03-11 | House | Committee Hearing 02:00 |
2021-02-24 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Government and Veterans Affairs Committee |
2021-01-18 | House | Received from Senate |
2021-01-15 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 47 nays 0 |
2021-01-14 | Senate | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 7 0 0 |
2021-01-14 | Senate | Committee Hearing 10:00 |
2021-01-05 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Government and Veterans Affairs Committee |