ND SB2043 | 2019-2020 | 66th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-09 - Signed by Governor 04/08
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-09 - Signed by Governor 04/08
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to amend and reenact subsection 1 of section 50-11.1-04, section 50-11.1-07.8, subsection 1 of section 50-11.1-17, and subsection 2 of section 50-25.1-11 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to regulation of early childhood services and claims of child abuse and neglect.
Title
Regulation of early childhood services and claims of child abuse and neglect.
Sponsors
Sen. Curtiss Kreun [R] | Sen. Gary Lee [R] | Sen. Nicole Poolman [R] | Sen. David Hogue [R] |
Rep. Thomas Beadle [R] | Rep. Emily O'Brien [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-03 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - House - House Second reading (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-01-25 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - House - House Second reading (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-01-25 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-09 | Senate | Signed by Governor 04/08 |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-04-05 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 47 nays 0 |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Concurred |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Returned to Senate (12) |
2019-03-27 | House | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 90 nays 0 |
2019-03-22 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2019-03-21 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 13 0 1 |
2019-03-04 | House | Committee Hearing 09:15 |
2019-02-14 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Human Services Committee |
2019-01-28 | House | Received from Senate |
2019-01-25 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 47 nays 0 |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2019-01-23 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 6 0 0 |
2019-01-08 | Senate | Committee Hearing 10:00 |
2019-01-03 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Human Services Committee |