ND 2027 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-06 - Signed by Governor 04/05
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT to create and enact chapters 4.1-23, 4.1-33, 4.1-34, 4.1-35, 4.1-36, 4.1-37, 4.1-38, 4.1-39, and 4.1-40 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to revisions of agriculture laws regarding plant pests, pesticides, chemigation regulation, pesticide container disposal, anhydrous ammonia facilities, anhydrous ammonia risk management, crop protection products, and the fertilizer and soil conditioner law; to amend and reenact subsection? 19 of section 19-02.1-01 and sections 23-01-01.1 and 23-01-25 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the definition of a pesticide chemical and the state department of health; to repeal chapters 19-18, 19-20.1, 19-20.2, and 19-20.3 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to pesticides, fertilizers and soil conditioners, anhydrous ammonia facilities, and anhydrous ammonia risk management; and to provide a penalty.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Pesticides, fertilizers and soil conditioners, anhydrous ammonia facilities, and anhydrous ammonia risk management; and to provide a penalty.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-31 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - House - House Second reading (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-01-18 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-06SenateSigned by Governor 04/05
2017-04-03SenateSent to Governor
2017-04-03SenateSigned by President
2017-04-03HouseSigned by Speaker
2017-03-31SenateSecond reading, passed, yeas 44 nays 0
2017-03-31SenateConcurred
2017-03-29SenateReturned to Senate (12)
2017-03-28HouseSecond reading, passed as amended, yeas 92 nays 0
2017-03-27HouseAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2017-03-24HouseReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 12 0 2
2017-03-09HouseCommittee Hearing 09:00
2017-02-09HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Agriculture Committee
2017-02-02HouseReceived from Senate
2017-01-18SenateSecond reading, passed, yeas 45 nays 0
2017-01-17SenateAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2017-01-16SenateReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 6 0 0
2017-01-05SenateCommittee Hearing 10:15
2017-01-03SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred Agriculture Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback