ND SB2012 | 2013-2014 | 63rd Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 24 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-24 - Signed by Governor 05/14
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 24 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-24 - Signed by Governor 05/14
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to provide an appropriation for defraying the expenses of the department of transportation; to provide appropriations to the state treasurer for transportation funding distributions; to provide an appropriation to the department of corrections and rehabilitation for costs related to a general license plate issue; to amend and reenact sections 39-02-03, 39-04-09, and 57-43.2-19 of the North Dakota Century Code and section
Title
Department of transportation motor vehicle branch offices, the issuance of license plates, deposits of special fuels excise taxes, and transportation funding distributions to non-oil-producing political subdivisions; to provide for transfers and contingent transfers; to provide exemptions; to provide for budget section reports; to provide for legislative management studies; to provide an effective date; to provide an expiration date; and to declare an emergency.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-24 | Senate | Signed by Governor 05/14 |
2013-05-03 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2013-05-02 | Senate | Signed by President |
2013-05-02 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2013-05-02 | House | Emergency clause carried |
2013-05-02 | House | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 90 nays 0 |
2013-05-02 | House | Conference committee report adopted |
2013-05-01 | House | Reported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 47 nays 0, Emergency clause carried |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Conference committee report adopted |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Reported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar |
2013-04-18 | House | Conference committee appointed Brandenburg Thoreson Guggisberg |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Conference committee appointed G. Lee Holmberg O'Connell |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Refused to concur |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Returned to Senate (12) |
2013-04-17 | House | Emergency clause carried |
2013-04-17 | House | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 86 nays 5 |
2013-04-17 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2013-04-16 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 17 3 2 |
2013-03-11 | House | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2013-03-06 | House | Introduced, first reading, (emergency), referred Appropriations Committee |
2013-02-26 | House | Received from Senate |
2013-02-25 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 47 nays 0, Emergency clause carried |
2013-02-25 | Senate | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2013-02-22 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 12 0 1 |
2013-01-17 | Senate | Committee Hearing 08:30 |
2013-01-08 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, (emergency), referred Appropriations Committee |