ND HB1545 | 2019-2020 | 66th Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 12 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-21 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 7 nays 39
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 12 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-21 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 7 nays 39
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL for an Act to provide for a legislative management study of replacing the revenue generated by property tax with an alternative funding source.
Title
A BILL for an Act to provide for a legislative management study of replacing the revenue generated by property tax with an alternative funding source.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-21 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 7 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-11 - House - House Second reading (Y: 66 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - House - House Second reading (Y: 66 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-21 | Senate | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 7 nays 39 |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 5 1 0 |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Committee Hearing 10:15 |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Finance and Taxation Committee |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Received from House |
2019-02-11 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 66 nays 27 |
2019-02-06 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2019-02-05 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 10 4 0 |
2019-01-30 | House | Committee Hearing 10:30 |
2019-01-14 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Finance and Taxation Committee |