ND 1514 | 2021 | 67th Legislative Assembly Special Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Passed on November 12 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-11-12 - Signed by Governor 11/12
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT to create and enact a new section to chapter 43-12.1, a new section to chapter 43-15, and a new section to chapter 43-17 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to disciplinary actions by the board of nursing, board of pharmacy, and board of medicine; and to provide an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Disciplinary actions by the board of nursing, board of pharmacy, and board of medicine; and to provide an effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-11-12 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 38 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-11-11 - House - House Second reading (Y: 81 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-11-12HouseSigned by Governor 11/12
2021-11-12HouseSent to Governor
2021-11-12HouseSigned by Speaker
2021-11-12SenateSigned by President
2021-11-12HouseReturned to House
2021-11-12SenateSecond reading, passed, yeas 38 nays 9
2021-11-11SenateEngrossment placed on calendar 13 3 0
2021-11-11SenateIntroduced, first reading
2021-11-11SenateReceived from House
2021-11-11HouseSecond reading, passed, yeas 81 nays 11
2021-11-11HouseAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2021-11-11HouseReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 13 3 0
2021-11-11HouseLaid over one legislative day
2021-11-09SenateCommittee Hearing 09:45
2021-11-08HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Joint Technical Corrections Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback