ND HB1511 | 2019-2020 | 66th Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-05 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 16 nays 76
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-05 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 16 nays 76
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact section 15.1-21-02.6 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to removing limits on the scholarship awards provided to eligible students under the North Dakota academic scholarship program and the North Dakota career and technical education scholarship program.
Title
Removing limits on the scholarship awards provided to eligible students under the North Dakota academic scholarship program and the North Dakota career and technical education scholarship program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-05 - House - House Second reading (Y: 16 N: 76 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-05 | House | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 16 nays 76 |
2019-01-31 | House | Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 11 2 1 |
2019-01-29 | House | Committee Hearing 09:15 |
2019-01-14 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Education Committee |