ND 1485 | 2019-2020 | 66th Legislative Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 12-0)
Status: Passed on April 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-01 - Signed by Governor 03/28
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT to provide for a legislative management study of consumer personal data disclosures.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to provide for a legislative management study of consumer personal data disclosures.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-20 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 43 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - House - House Second reading (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-01HouseSigned by Governor 03/28
2019-03-25HouseSent to Governor
2019-03-25HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-03-22SenateSigned by President
2019-03-21HouseReturned to House
2019-03-20SenateSecond reading, passed, yeas 43 nays 2
2019-03-19SenateReported back, do pass, place on calendar 5 1 0
2019-03-13SenateCommittee Hearing 08:00
2019-02-20SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred Industry, Business and Labor Committee
2019-02-20SenateReceived from House
2019-02-19HouseSecond reading, passed, yeas 93 nays 0
2019-02-18HouseAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2019-02-15HouseReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 13 1 0
2019-02-12HouseCommittee Hearing 09:00
2019-02-06HouseCommittee Hearing 09:00
2019-01-14HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Industry, Business and Labor Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback