ND HB1480 | 2019-2020 | 66th Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 9-3)
Status: Engrossed on February 18 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-18 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 13 nays 33
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 18 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-18 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 13 nays 33
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL for an Act to provide for a legislative management study on the capturing of gas and the long-term benefits of capturing gas on the state's revenue stream.
Title
A BILL for an Act to provide for a legislative management study on the capturing of gas and the long-term benefits of capturing gas on the state's revenue stream.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-18 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 13 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2019-02-15 - House - House Second reading (Y: 87 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-02-15 - House - House Second reading (Y: 87 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-18 | Senate | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 13 nays 33 |
2019-03-15 | Senate | Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 5 1 0 |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Committee Hearing 09:30 |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Energy and Natural Resources Committee |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Received from House |
2019-02-15 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 87 nays 3 |
2019-02-12 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2019-02-11 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 11 1 2 |
2019-02-06 | House | Rereferred to Transportation |
2019-02-05 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2019-02-04 | House | Reported back amended, do not pass, placed on calendar 8 5 1 |
2019-02-01 | House | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2019-01-14 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Transportation Committee |