ND HB1477 | 2019-2020 | 66th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-09 - Signed by Governor 04/08
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-09 - Signed by Governor 04/08
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to create and enact a new section to chapter 12.1-31 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to prohibiting the sale of flavored e-liquid to minors; and to provide a penalty.
Title
Prohibiting the sale of flavored e-liquid to minors; and to provide a penalty.
Sponsors
Rep. Alisa Mitskog [D] | Sen. Judy Lee [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-03 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 10 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-03 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 10 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-11 - House - House Second reading (Y: 60 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 10 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-11 - House - House Second reading (Y: 60 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-09 | House | Signed by Governor 04/08 |
2019-04-05 | House | Sent to Governor |
2019-04-05 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-04-03 | House | Returned to House |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 46 nays 1 |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Division B passed |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Division A lost |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Division of bill |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 6 0 0 |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Committee Hearing 11:00 |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Received from House |
2019-02-11 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 60 nays 33 |
2019-02-06 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2019-02-05 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 11 1 2 |
2019-01-21 | House | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2019-01-14 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Human Services Committee |