ND 1461 | 2019-2020 | 66th Legislative Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on May 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-02 - Signed by Governor 05/01
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT to create and enact two new sections to chapter 15.1-32 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to reading screenings and a dyslexia screening pilot program; to provide for a report to the legislative management; and to provide for an exemption.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Reading screenings and a dyslexia screening pilot program; to provide for a report to the legislative management; and to provide for an exemption.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-24 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - House - House Second reading (Y: 88 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - House - House Second reading (Y: 88 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-15 - House - House Second reading (Y: 87 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-02HouseSigned by Governor 05/01
2019-04-25HouseSent to Governor
2019-04-25HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-04-24SenateSigned by President
2019-04-24SenateSecond reading, passed as amended, yeas 47 nays 0
2019-04-24SenateConference committee report adopted
2019-04-23SenateReported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar
2019-04-23HouseSecond reading, passed, yeas 88 nays 3
2019-04-23HouseConference committee report adopted
2019-04-23HouseReported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar
2019-04-10SenateConference committee appointed Davison Schaible Oban
2019-04-08HouseConference committee appointed Schreiber-Beck Strinden Hager
2019-04-08HouseRefused to concur
2019-04-03HouseReturned to House (12)
2019-04-03SenateSecond reading, passed as amended, yeas 47 nays 0
2019-04-03SenateAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2019-04-02SenateReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 5 2 0
2019-03-20SenateCommittee Hearing 10:00
2019-02-19SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred Education Committee
2019-02-18SenateReceived from House
2019-02-15HouseSecond reading, passed, yeas 87 nays 2
2019-02-14HouseAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2019-02-13HouseReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 13 0 1
2019-02-06HouseCommittee Hearing 08:30
2019-01-14HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Education Committee

North Dakota State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/66-2019/bill-actions/ba1461.html
Texthttps://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/66-2019/documents/19-0557-05000.pdf
Texthttps://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/66-2019/documents/19-0557-05004a.pdf
Texthttps://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/66-2019/documents/19-0557-06000.pdf
Texthttps://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/66-2019/documents/19-0557-07000.pdf
Texthttps://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/66-2019/documents/19-0557-08000.pdf
Texthttps://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/66-2019/documents/19-0557-09000.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/66-2019/journals/hr-dailyjnl-30.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/66-2019/journals/sr-dailyjnl-59.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/66-2019/journals/hr-dailyjnl-73.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/66-2019/journals/sr-dailyjnl-74.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback