ND HB1448 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-23 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 34 nays 58
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL for an Act to create and enact section 54-58-04 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to tribal-state gaming compacts and authorization of online gaming and online sports betting by tribes; and to provide a contingent effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Tribal-state gaming compacts and authorization of online gaming and online sports betting by tribes; and to provide a contingent effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-23 - House - House Second reading (Y: 34 N: 58 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-23HouseSecond reading, failed to pass, yeas 34 nays 58
2021-02-22HouseLaid over one legislative day
2021-02-19HouseAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2021-02-18HouseReported back amended, without recommendation 13 1 0
2021-02-09HouseCommittee Hearing 10:30
2021-01-18HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback