ND HB1443 | 2009-2010 | 61st Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-02-10 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 018 nays 071
Status: Introduced on January 19 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-02-10 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 018 nays 071
Summary
Introduced by Sen. Bakke, Flakoll, Taylor A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact subsection 1 of section 15.1-21-02 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to a high school course in consumer finance.
Title
Introduced by Sen. Bakke, Flakoll, Taylor A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact subsection 1 of section 15.1-21-02 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to a high school course in consumer finance.
Sponsors
Rep. Lisa Meier [R] | Rep. Dave Weiler [R] | Rep. Lisa Wolf [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-02-10 | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 018 nays 071 | |
2009-02-06 | Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar y 012 n 000 | |
2009-02-03 | Committee Hearing 11:30 | |
2009-01-19 | Introduced, first reading, referred Education |
North Dakota State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/61-2009/bill-actions/ba1443.html |