ND HB1433 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-03 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 16 nays 77
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-03 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 16 nays 77
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL for an Act to create and enact a new section to chapter 65-01 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to workers' compensation benefits for essential workers; to provide for retroactive application; and to provide an expiration date.
Title
Workers' compensation benefits for essential workers; to provide for retroactive application; and to provide an expiration date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-03 - House - House Second reading (Y: 16 N: 77 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-03 | House | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 16 nays 77 |
2021-01-28 | House | Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 12 2 0 |
2021-01-27 | House | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2021-01-18 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Industry, Business and Labor Committee |