ND 1428 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-04 - Signed by Governor 04/03
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT to amend and reenact subsection 2 of section 15.1-23-09 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to home education standards.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Home education standards.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-24 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 30 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - House - House Second reading (Y: 58 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-04HouseSigned by Governor 04/03
2017-03-29HouseSent to Governor
2017-03-29HouseSigned by Speaker
2017-03-28SenateSigned by President
2017-03-27HouseReturned to House
2017-03-24SenateSecond reading, passed, yeas 30 nays 17
2017-03-23SenateReported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 4 2 0
2017-03-08SenateCommittee Hearing 09:30
2017-02-20SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred Education Committee
2017-02-20SenateReceived from House
2017-02-16HouseSecond reading, passed, yeas 58 nays 31
2017-02-09HouseReported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 8 4 2
2017-01-31HouseCommittee Hearing 10:00
2017-01-16HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Education Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback