ND 1427 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-2)
Status: Passed on April 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-20 - Signed by Governor 04/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT to provide for duties of the commission on juvenile justice and the children's cabinet and to create a juvenile justice planning committee, a planning committee for children in need of services, and a planning committee for alternatives to juvenile detention.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to provide for duties of the commission on juvenile justice and the children's cabinet and to create a juvenile justice planning committee, a planning committee for children in need of services, and a planning committee for alternatives to juvenile detention.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-06 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 43 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-15 - House - House Second reading (Y: 90 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-20HouseSigned by Governor 04/19
2021-04-15HouseSent to Governor
2021-04-14HouseSigned by Speaker
2021-04-08SenateSigned by President
2021-04-06HouseReturned to House
2021-04-06SenateSecond reading, passed, yeas 43 nays 4
2021-04-05SenateReported back, do pass, place on calendar 7 0 0
2021-03-30SenateCommittee Hearing 09:45
2021-02-17SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee
2021-02-16SenateReceived from House
2021-02-15HouseSecond reading, passed, yeas 90 nays 4
2021-02-03HouseAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2021-02-02HouseReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 12 1 1
2021-02-01HouseCommittee Hearing 10:30
2021-01-26HouseCommittee Hearing 10:30
2021-01-18HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback