ND 1420 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 17 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-03-09 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 3 nays 44
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL for an Act to provide for a study of the curriculum requirements of history majors at public institutions of higher education in the state.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A BILL for an Act to provide for a study of the curriculum requirements of history majors at public institutions of higher education in the state.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-09 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 3 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-01-31 - House - House Second reading (Y: 49 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-09SenateSecond reading, failed to pass, yeas 3 nays 44
2017-03-08SenateReported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 6 0 0
2017-03-07SenateCommittee Hearing 09:30
2017-02-17SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred Education Committee
2017-02-17SenateReceived from House
2017-01-31HouseSecond reading, passed, yeas 49 nays 45
2017-01-27HouseAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2017-01-26HouseReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 12 0 2
2017-01-25HouseCommittee Hearing 09:30
2017-01-16HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Education Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback