ND HB1400 | 2009-2010 | 61st Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 19 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-19 - Filed with Secretary of State
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 19 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-19 - Filed with Secretary of State
Summary
Introduced by Sen. Flakoll, Holmberg, Taylor A BILL for an Act to create and enact two new sections to chapter 15-20.1, two new sections to chapter 15.1-02, two new sections to chapter 15.1-06, two new sections to chapter 15.1-07, a new section to chapter 15.1-09, a new section to chapter 15.1-13, chapter 15.1-18.2, sections 15.1-21-02.3, 15.1-21-02.4, 15.1-21-02.5, 15.1-21-02.6, and 15.1-21-02.7, seven new sections to chapter 15.1-21, two new sections to chapter 15.1-27, and three new sections to chapter 15.1-37 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to career development facilitation, student health insurance, the use of federal stimulus dollars, school personnel, student information systems, school district insurance, national board certification, program and course requirements, assessments, state aid payments, and an early childhood education council; to amend and reenact sections 15.1-06-04, 15.1-09.1-10, 15.1-21-02, 15.1-21-02.1, 15.1-23-03, 15.1-23-17, 15.1-27-03.1, 15.1-27-04, 15.1-27-07.2, 15.1-27-11, 15.1-27-19, 15.1-27-35, 15.1-27-35.3, 15.1-27-41, 15.1-32-18, 15.1-36-01, 15.1-38-01.1, and 57-15-14 of the North Dakota Century Code and section 55 of chapter 163 of the 2007 Session Laws, relating to school calendars, course requirements, home education, state aid payments, special education, school construction, English language learners, and school district general fund levies; to repeal sections 15.1-21-02.2, 15.1-27-20.1, 15.1-27-41, and 15.1-38-01.2 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to high school graduation requirements, the minimum mill levy offset, the commission on education improvement, and new immigrant English language learners; to provide an appropriation; to provide a continuing appropriation; to provide for compensation increases; to provide for the distribution of supplemental one-time grants, supplemental operations grants, teacher support system grants, transportation grants, reorganization planning grants, regional education association grants, baseline recalculation grants, and contingency payments; to provide for a contingent transfer; to provide for legislative council studies and reports; to provide an effective date; to provide an expiration date; and to declare an emergency.
Title
Introduced by Sen. Flakoll, Holmberg, Taylor A BILL for an Act to create and enact two new sections to chapter 15-20.1, two new sections to chapter 15.1-02, two new sections to chapter 15.1-06, two new sections to chapter 15.1-07, a new section to chapter 15.1-09, a new section to chapter 15.1-13, chapter 15.1-18.2, sections 15.1-21-02.3, 15.1-21-02.4, 15.1-21-02.5, 15.1-21-02.6, and 15.1-21-02.7, seven new sections to chapter 15.1-21, two new sections to chapter 15.1-27, and three new sections to chapter 15.1-37 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to career development facilitation, student health insurance, the use of federal stimulus dollars, school personnel, student information systems, school district insurance, national board certification, program and course requirements, assessments, state aid payments, and an early childhood education council; to amend and reenact sections 15.1-06-04, 15.1-09.1-10, 15.1-21-02, 15.1-21-02.1, 15.1-23-03, 15.1-23-17, 15.1-27-03.1, 15.1-27-04, 15.1-27-07.2, 15.1-27-11, 15.1-27-19, 15.1-27-35, 15.1-27-35.3, 15.1-27-41, 15.1-32-18, 15.1-36-01, 15.1-38-01.1, and 57-15-14 of the North Dakota Century Code and section 55 of chapter 163 of the 2007 Session Laws, relating to school calendars, course requirements, home education, state aid payments, special education, school construction, English language learners, and school district general fund levies; to repeal sections 15.1-21-02.2, 15.1-27-20.1, 15.1-27-41, and 15.1-38-01.2 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to high school graduation requirements, the minimum mill levy offset, the commission on education improvement, and new immigrant English language learners; to provide an appropriation; to provide a continuing appropriation; to provide for compensation increases; to provide for the distribution of supplemental one-time grants, supplemental operations grants, teacher support system grants, transportation grants, reorganization planning grants, regional education association grants, baseline recalculation grants, and contingency payments; to provide for a contingent transfer; to provide for legislative council studies and reports; to provide an effective date; to provide an expiration date; and to declare an emergency.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-19 | Filed with Secretary of State | |
2009-05-19 | Signed by Governor | |
2009-05-02 | Sent to Governor | |
2009-05-02 | Signed by Speaker | |
2009-05-02 | Signed by President | |
2009-05-01 | Emergency clause carried | |
2009-05-01 | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 046 nays 000 | |
2009-05-01 | Conference committee report adopted | |
2009-05-01 | Reported back from conf comm, placed on calendar (Senate recede) | |
2009-05-01 | Second reading passed, y 086 n 006 Emergency clause carried | |
2009-05-01 | Conference committee report adopted | |
2009-05-01 | Reported back from conf comm, placed on calendar (Senate recede) | |
2009-04-14 | Conf comm appointed Freborg Flakoll Taylor | |
2009-04-10 | Conf comm appointed Weisz Bellew Potter | |
2009-04-10 | Refused to concur | |
2009-04-07 | Returned to House (12) | |
2009-04-07 | Emergency clause carried | |
2009-04-07 | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 046 nays 000 | |
2009-04-07 | Amendment failed | |
2009-04-07 | Amended on floor | |
2009-04-07 | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar | |
2009-04-06 | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment poc y 013 n 000 | |
2009-03-23 | Committee Hearing 02:30 | |
2009-03-20 | Rereferred to Appropriations | |
2009-03-20 | Amendment adopted | |
2009-03-20 | Amended on floor | |
2009-03-19 | Laid over one legislative day | |
2009-03-18 | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment poc y 004 n 001 | |
2009-03-09 | Committee Hearing 08:30 | |
2009-02-25 | Introduced, first reading, (emergency), referred Education | |
2009-02-25 | Received from House | |
2009-02-19 | Second reading passed, y 078 n 016 Emergency clause carried | |
2009-02-17 | Reported back, do pass, placed on calendar y 015 n 009 | |
2009-02-11 | Rereferred to Appropriations | |
2009-02-11 | Amendment adopted | |
2009-02-10 | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment poc y 012 n 002 | |
2009-01-26 | Committee Hearing 02:00 | |
2009-01-26 | Committee Hearing 09:00 | |
2009-01-12 | Introduced, first reading, (emergency), referred Education |
North Dakota State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/61-2009/bill-actions/ba1400.html |